CONTRACTING, CONSULTING, ENGINEERING LLC v. USA

Plaintiff: CONTRACTING, CONSULTING, ENGINEERING LLC
Defendant: USA
Intervenor_defendant: DYNCORP INTERNATIONAL LLC,
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00097
Filed: February 10, 2012
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Christine O.C. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2012 43 Featured Case PUBLISHED OPINION - Originally filed Under Seal on Feb. 24, 2012. Denying plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction and scheduling briefing for cross-motions for judgment on the Admin. Record. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg) Copy to parties.
March 19, 2012 50 Featured Case PUBLISHED OPINION - Denying plaintiff's 38 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record; granting plaintiff's 39 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record with a caveat re TEP evaluators; granting plaintiff's 40 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record in part. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg) Copy to parties.
April 16, 2012 73 Featured Case PUBLISHED OPINION - Granting plaintiff's motion for judgment on the administrative record. This post-award bid protest opinion was originally filed under seal on April 3, 2012. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: CONTRACTING, CONSULTING, ENGINEERING LLC v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONTRACTING, CONSULTING, ENGINEERING LLC
Represented By: David Scott Black
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Devin Andrew Wolak
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: DYNCORP INTERNATIONAL LLC,
Represented By: Richard James Vacura
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]