WEGCO, INC v. USA

Plaintiff: WEGCO, INC
Defendant: USA
Intervenor_defendant: PM SERVICES COMPANY
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00328
Filed: May 24, 2012
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2012 11 Featured Case STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/25/2012 at 2:00 PM(EDT)before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
May 25, 2012 12 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Administrative Record due by 6/4/2012. Response to motion for a preliminary injunction due by 6/11/2012. Reply to its motion for preliminary injunction due by 6/18/2012. Oral Argument set for 6/20/2012 at 10:00 AM (EDT) in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
June 1, 2012 15 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
June 12, 2012 25 Featured Case ORDER granting 23 Motion to Strike a declaration attached to plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
June 14, 2012 26 Featured Case ORDER: the court finds the administrative record, filed on June 4, 2012,to be inadequate. Defendant shall file on CD-ROM, and effectuate service to all parties by close of business on June 18, 2012. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
June 20, 2012 31 Featured Case ORDER denying 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and denying defendant's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
June 20, 2012 32 Featured Case STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 5:30 p.m. (EDT) on Friday, 6/22/2012. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
June 25, 2012 34 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Brief due by 7/16/2012. Stipulation of dismissal due by 7/16/2012. Cross Motions due by 8/6/2012. Reply due by 8/20/2012. Response by 9/4/2012. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: WEGCO, INC v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WEGCO, INC
Represented By: James Stephen DelSordo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Speck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: PM SERVICES COMPANY
Represented By: E. Sanderson Hoe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]