UNITED LAUNCH SERVICES, LLC et al v. USA

Defendant: USA
Plaintiff: UNITED LAUNCH SERVICES, LLC and THE BOEING COMPANY
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00380
Filed: June 14, 2012
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Lawrence M. Baskir
Referring Judge: Marian Blank Horn
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 20, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
February 25, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Order: A preliminary Status Conference set for 3/8/2013 at 10:00 AM (EST) in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
March 8, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery complete by 2/28/2014. Exchange Opening Expert Reports by 3/31/2014. Exchange Rebuttal Expert Reports by 5/5/2014. Begin Taking Expert Depositions by 5/19/2014. Expert Discovery complete by 6/16/2014. Joint Status Report due by 6/30/2014. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
May 30, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court CLAWBACK ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
May 30, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: UNITED LAUNCH SERVICES, LLC et al v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Corinne A. Niosi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED LAUNCH SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Carl John Nichols
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE BOEING COMPANY
Represented By: Carl John Nichols
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]