BAILEY, JR. et al v. USA

Plaintiff: CATHY BAILEY, MAVIS A. GOLDMAN, JASMINE J. ROBERSON and ARTHUR P. BAILEY, JR.
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2012cv00507
Filed: August 14, 2012
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CERTIFYING CLASS. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis) Copy to parties.
January 23, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court CLASS ACTION NOTICE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Class notice to be sent on or before 2/6/2013; Class members must return entry of appearance form on or before 5/7/2013; Amended complaint on or before 6/6/2013; Other deadlines as provided. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis) Copy to parties.
September 6, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties shall notify the court whether there are any remaining Claims Book objections due by 10/10/2013. Joint Status Report due by 3/14/2014. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
October 18, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties shall notify the court regarding whether there are any remaining Claims Book objections due by 10/31/2013. Joint Status Report due by 3/14/2014. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
November 4, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/14/2013 at 10:00 AM (EST)before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
November 14, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The parties shall file a proposed schedule for the completion of tasks. Notice of Compliance due by 11/21/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
November 22, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER: re: 24 Joint Proposed Scheduling. The parties shall appoint an appraisal expert due by 12/15/2013. Joint Status Report on the progress of the appraiser due by 2/19/2014. The final appraisal report shall be completed due by 4/15/2014. Joint Status Report indicating how this case should proceed due by 6/17/2014. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
October 2, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
December 12, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Order: Telephonic Preliminary Status Conference set for 12/17/2012 at 2:30 PM (EST) before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAILEY, JR. et al v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHY BAILEY
Represented By: John Robert Sears
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAVIS A. GOLDMAN
Represented By: John Robert Sears
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASMINE J. ROBERSON
Represented By: John Robert Sears
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARTHUR P. BAILEY, JR.
Represented By: John Robert Sears
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]