EXTREME COATINGS, INC. v. USA

Defendant: USA
Plaintiff: EXTREME COATINGS, INC.
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00516
Filed: August 15, 2012
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Lynn J. Bush
Referring Judge: Christine O.C. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2013 11 Featured Case PUBLISHED OPINION on 8 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Counts I, II, III, IV, V, & portions of Count IX of the Complaint filed by USA ; denying 8 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(6). Defendant shall file an ANSWER, or otherwise respond to the complaint, by 3/22/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
May 29, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER granting 15 Motion for Entry of Non-Waiver Agreement. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
May 29, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER Stipulated Non-Waiver Agreement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 502 Regarding Production of Documents. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
May 30, 2013 19 Featured Case DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Disclosures between the parties due by June 3, 2013. Fact Discovery due by 12/13/2013. On or before December 16, 2013, the parties shall disclose expert witnesses. Plaintiff's Expert Re port(s) due by 3/10/2014. Defendant's rebuttal expert report(s) due by May 1, 2014. Expert discovery shall be completed on or before June 23, 2014. Status Report due by 7/7/2014. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
November 5, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete DiscoveryFact Discovery due by 2/11/2014. On or before 2/14/2014, the parties shall disclose expert witnesses; Plaintiffs expert report(s) shall be disclosed on or before 5/9/2014; Defendants rebuttal expert report(s) shall be disclosed on or before 6/30/2014. All expert discovery shall be COMPLETED no later than 8/22/2014; and On 9/5/2014, or two weeks after completion of discovery, whichever occurs earlier, c ounsel are directed to FILE a Joint Status Report. The status report shall state whether settlement is a feasible option in this case or whether the parties intend to file dispositive motions. If dispositive motions are to be filed, the status report shall set forth a proposed schedule in that regard. If neither settlement nor dispositive motions are viable, the parties shall set forth a proposed schedule for the exchanges required by Appendix A, 13 and the filings required by 14 through 17. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
January 6, 2014 24 Featured Case ORDER granting 23 Motion for Extension of TimeFact Discovery due by 4/14/2014. Expert Witnesses disclosed by 4/16/2014. Plaintiff's Expert Report(s) disclosed by 7/8/2014. Defendant's Rebuttal Expert Report(s) disclosed by 8/29/2014; Expert Discovery completed by 10/21/2014. Status Report due by 11/4/2014 Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: EXTREME COATINGS, INC. v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Alex P. Hontos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EXTREME COATINGS, INC.
Represented By: Michael H. Payne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]