RQ SQUARED, LLC v. USA

Plaintiff: RQ SQUARED, LLC
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2012cv00527
Filed: August 21, 2012
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Lynn J. Bush
Referring Judge: Bohdan A. Futey
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time.JPSR due by 7/17/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
July 10, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brian Cantwell Duffy terminated. The Clerk's Office is directed to SUSPEND all proceedings in this matter until further order of the court; and the Clerk's Office is directed t o SERVE a copy of this order, via Federal Express (two-day delivery) to plaintiff at the following address: RQ Squared LLC, 620 Francis Street, Suite 220, St. Joseph, MO 64501. Plaintiff shall FILE a Motion to Substitute Counsel, pursuant to RCFC 83.1(c)(4), on or before August 15, 2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
August 7, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to file RQ Squared LLC's August 3, 2013 facsimile as plaintiff's Notice of Change of Address/Motion for Enlargment of Time. Once filed, motion for enlargment of time is granted. Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Counsel due by 10/15/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
October 21, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to file plaintiff's October 15,2013 facsimile as plaintiff's Notice/Motion for Enlargement of Time. Once filed, motion is granted. Plaintiff shall file a Motion to Substitute Counsel by 1/14/2014. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RQ SQUARED, LLC v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RQ SQUARED, LLC
Represented By: Brian Cantwell Duffy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Joshua Ethan Kurland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]