O'BRIEN v. USA

Plaintiff: DAVID E. O'BRIEN
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2012cv00554
Filed: August 30, 2012
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 8 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Judgment on the Administrative RecordConsent MOTION for E xtension of Time to File Response as to 8 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Judgment on the Administrative Record, 8 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Judgment on the Administrative Record. Response due by 3/4/2013. No further enlargements of this deadline will be granted. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
February 28, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting, in part, and denying, in part 13 Motion for Extension of Time. Supplemented Administrative Record due by 3/11/2013. Response due by 3/25/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
March 22, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/29/2013 at 10:00 AM (EDT) before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
March 29, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pursuant to the parties agreement during the conference, the administrative record will remain sealed, but necessary references to the record in filings will neither be sealed nor redacted. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
April 17, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until May 10, 2013 to File Response as to 20 CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to 8 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA ; Response due by 5/10/2013. Reply due by 5/24/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
November 6, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 8 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record: Oral Argument set for 1/7/2014 at 10:00 AM (EST) in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
September 11, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
October 22, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due by 11/28/2012. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'BRIEN v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID E. O'BRIEN
Represented By: Raymond Jewell Toney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Michael Damien Snyder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]