KELLOGG BROWN & ROOT SERVICES, INC., v. USA

Defendant: USA
Plaintiff: KELLOGG BROWN & ROOT SERVICES, INC.,
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00780
Filed: November 16, 2012
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
County: None
Presiding Judge: Lynn J. Bush
 
Nature of Suit: Contract - Service (CDA)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE pending briefing in related case (13-169). Once briefing is completed in related case, the court shall determine the scope of the oral argument requested by plaintiff. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
August 1, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 8 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by USA. The parties are directed to confer and agree to a mutually acceptable date for oral argument on defendants motions to be held in Washington, D.C. The court has the following dates available: August 14, 2013, August 15, 2013; and August 20, 2013. The parties shall CONFER and CONTACT chambers at 202-357-6532 with their proposed date for oral argument by 8/7/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
August 5, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER: Oral Argument set for 8/20/2013 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Lynn J. Bush. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
September 24, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave to File Plaintiff's Supplement Brief. Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief due by 9/30/2013. Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief due by 10/15/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
October 9, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion to Stay. Immediately upon restoration of appropriations to the DOJ, the parties shall CONFER and, as soon as practible thereafter, shall FILE a Status Report setting forth an agreed upon deadline for the filing of defendant's response to plaintiff's supplemental briefing before the court in this matter. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
October 21, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY, SCHEDULING ORDER. Defendant's Response to plaintiff's supplemental briefing due by 10/25/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
March 7, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORTED OPINION granting 8 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1). The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: KELLOGG BROWN & ROOT SERVICES, INC., v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELLOGG BROWN & ROOT SERVICES, INC.,
Represented By: Raymond Brian Biagini
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]