CENTERSCOPE TECHNOLOGIES, INC. v. USA

Plaintiff: CENTERSCOPE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Defendant: USA
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00883
Filed: December 14, 2012
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
 
Nature of Suit: Contract - (Pre Award) Injunctions

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2012 10 Featured Case SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
December 19, 2012 11 Featured Case STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/20/2012 at 2:00 PM (EST) before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
December 21, 2012 13 Featured Case ORDER granting 12 Motion to Consolidate Cases. All further filings in this matter should be filed in Insight Systems Corp. v. United States, 12-863C (Fed. Cl.). Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
December 14, 2012 8 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Proposed Protective order due 12/17/2012. Joint Status Report due by 12/19/2012. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: CENTERSCOPE TECHNOLOGIES, INC. v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTERSCOPE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: John R. Tolle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Matthew Paul Roche
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]