SMITH v. USA

Plaintiff: DAVID R. SMITH
Defendant: USA
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00094
Filed: February 4, 2013
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
County: None
Presiding Judge: Lynn J. Bush
 
Nature of Suit: Military Pay - Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record with forty-four additional pages. Docket No. 16-2 shall be filed as a Supplement to AR filed on 5/22/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
August 14, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Motion to Amend Schedule; ; Cross Motions due by 9/9/2013. Plaintiff's Reply/Response due by 10/18/13. Defendant's Reply due by 11/8/13. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
February 21, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORTED OPINION denying 19 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record; granting 22 Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record; granting 23 Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (rl) Copy to parties.
April 8, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court UNREPORTED ORDER denying 31 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (rl) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: SMITH v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID R. SMITH
Represented By: Phillip Leon Davidson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]