ALMANZA v. USA

Defendant: USA
Plaintiff: MANUEL ALMANZA
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00130
Filed: February 20, 2013
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
 
Nature of Suit: Civilian Pay - Overtime Compensation

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2013 14 Featured Case STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/1/2013 at 2:00 PM (EDT) before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
September 10, 2013 19 Featured Case STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/20/2013 at 2:00 PM (EDT) before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
September 16, 2013 20 Featured Case STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Rescheduling 19 Status Conference Order. Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/19/2013 at 2:00 PM (EDT)before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
September 19, 2013 22 Featured Case ORDER: the parties shall file a revised version of the proposed notice to prospective class members. Notice of Compliance due by 10/2/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
October 18, 2013 27 Featured Case ORDER: Defendant shall file its reply to plaintiffs response to defendants motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, to transfer these claims. Reply due by 10/24/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
October 23, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER directing the parties to strike the last sentence of paragraph seven from the proposed notice 26 Notice, filed by all plaintiffs and Defendant (attachment #(1) Exhibit). Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
April 8, 2013 6 Featured Case SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
April 10, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time. Answer due by 5/22/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: ALMANZA v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANUEL ALMANZA
Represented By: David Luis Kern
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]