HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY (THE) v. USA

Plaintiff: HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY (THE)
Defendant: USA
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00500
Filed: July 22, 2013
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
 
Nature of Suit: Contract - Construction (CDA)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. The Clerk is directed to effectuate the transfer. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
May 27, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORTED OPINION granting 15 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1). Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (kb1)
August 8, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
September 16, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting, in part, 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Response due by 11/15/2013. No further enlargements of this deadline will be granted. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY (THE) v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY (THE)
Represented By: James Mulvaney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Austin Marshall Fulk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]