PARRA CONSULTING GROUP, INC. v. USA

Plaintiff: PARRA CONSULTING GROUP, INC.
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2013cv00794
Filed: October 15, 2013
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
October 15, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/17/2013 at 10:00 AM (EDT)before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
October 17, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
October 17, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER: Administrative Record on CD-ROM due by 11/1/2013. Motion for judgment on administrative record due by 11/22/2013. Response and its Cross Motions due by 12/13/2013. Reply due by 1/17/2014. Oral Argument set for 1/24/2014 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
November 18, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defendant to respond to 21 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record. Response due by 11/20/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
November 19, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file its motion for judgment on the administrative record due by 12/2/2013. Defendant shall file its response to plaintiff's motion and its cross-motions d ue by 12/23/2013. Plaintiff shall file its reply to defendant's response and its response to defendant's cross-motion due 1/8/2014. Defendant shall file its reply to plaintiff's response due 1/17/2014. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
December 19, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1) and (6). The Clerk is directed to dismiss the complaint pursuant to RCFC 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6). Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PARRA CONSULTING GROUP, INC. v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PARRA CONSULTING GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Antonio R. Franco(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Alexander V. Sverdlov
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]