Veale v. Florida Department of Health

Defendant: Shedina Veale and Florida Department of Health
Case Number: 2:2013cv00077
Filed: February 6, 2013
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 6 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; granting 11 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint ; denying as premature 12 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint ; granting 15 Plaintiff's Motion t o Strike Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and its exhibit (Doc. #11-1, 11-2) as a separate entry in the CM/ECF system Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 6/4/2013. (LMF)
July 29, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 23 is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff shall have up to and including August 16, 2013, to file a second amended complaint in accordance with this Order. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 7/29/2013. (LMF)
April 4, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 39 Order administratively closing case. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment dismissing the case with prejudice, and close the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 4/4/2014. (LMF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veale v. Florida Department of Health
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shedina Veale
Represented By: Benjamin H. Yormak
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Department of Health
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]