Thompson v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Paul Thompson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00232
Filed: March 25, 2013
 
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: Collier
Referring Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER granting 19 Unopposed Motion for Entry of Judgment under Sentence Four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) with Reversal and Remand of the Cause to the Defendant. The Decision of the Commissioner is hereby reversed and the case is remanded under sent ence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) to the Commissioner of Social Security: On remand, the Administrative Law Judge (ALJ) will update the record, further evaluate Plaintiff's residual functional capacity, and further evaluate the subjective com plaints in light of all of the evidence. The ALJ will obtain vocational expert evidence to determine whether Plaintiff can perform other works that exists in significant numbers in the national economy and ensure that the vocational expert testimony does not conflict with the Dictionary of Occupational Titles. The ALJ will then issue a new decision.The Clerk is directed to enter Judgment accordingly and CLOSE the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/18/2013. (LMF)
February 19, 2014 26 Featured Case ORDER accepting and adopting 25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 22 Report and Recommendation and is made a part of this Order for all purposes.The Application for Attorney's Fees 22 is GRANTED. Plaintiff is awarded $2,527.34 in attorney's fees which may be paid directly to counsel if the United States Department of Treasury determines that no federal debt is owed.Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/19/2014. (LMF)
May 20, 2014 27 Featured Case ORDER re 26 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations. The Clerk is directed to enter Judgment pursuant to the Court's May 9, 2014 Order 26 and close the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/20/2014. (LMF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Thompson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Thompson
Represented By: Adam S Neidenberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]