PNC Bank, N.A. v. DBAK Holdings, LLC et al

Plaintiff: PNC Bank, N.A.
Defendant: DBAK Holdings, LLC, Donna H. Keller, Brant Keller, Parker Commons Office Park Condominium Association Inc. and Unknown Occupants
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00247
Filed: March 29, 2013
 
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER granting 18 The Plaintiff, PNC Bank, N.A.'s Motion for Clerk's Default. The Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to enter a Clerk's Default against the Defendant DBAK Holdings, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/15/2013. (LMF)
September 27, 2013 43 Featured Case ORDER granting 42 Plaintiff's Motion for Clerk's Default. The Clerk is directed to enter a Clerk's Default against Defendant DBAK Holdings, LLC ONLY. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 9/27/2013. (LMF)
October 18, 2013 46 Featured Case ORDER granting 45 Plaintiff's Application for Clerk's Default Against the Unknown Occupants. The Clerk is directed to correct the caption of the case to ADD "Unknown Occupants n/k/a U.S. Health Advisors" as a defendant. The Clerk is thereafter directed to enter clerk's default against "Unknown Occupants n/k/a U.S. Health Advisors" ONLY. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/18/2013. (LMF)
December 2, 2013 50 Featured Case ORDER granting 48 PNC Bank N.A.'s Motion for Entry of Final Judgment as to Defendants DBAK Holdings LLC and Unknown Occupants, n/k/a U.S. Health Advisors. The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff against Defendant DBAK Holdings LL C as to Counts I, II, and III of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint in the amount of $259,999.80, plus pre-judgment interest from October 25, 2013, through the entry of judgment, and post-judgment interest thereafter accruing at the daily rate o f $46.85. The judgment shall also include an amount of $20,310.50 in attorney's fees and $2,394.21 in costs. The Clerk shall further enter judgment in favor of the Plaintiff against Defendant Unknown Occupants, n/k/a U.S. Health Advisors as to Count II of the Amended Complaint, Foreclosure of Real Property. Defendant DBAK Holdings is further directed to complete a Florida Rules of Civil Procedure, Form 1.977, Fact Information Sheet, including all required attachments, withi n 45 days of the entry of Judgment in this matter. Plaintiff shall have up to and including December 13, 2013, to move for a consent judgment or default against Defendant Parker Commons and inform the Court the status of the remaining Unknown Defendants. The Clerk of the Court shall provide a copy of this Order to the Defendants at the last known addresses in the Court file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 12/2/2013. (LMF)
December 16, 2013 54 Featured Case ORDER re 52 Notice (Other) filed by PNC Bank, N.A. This matter is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to PNC Bank's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Unknown Occupants 52 , with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. The Clerk shall withhold the entry of judgment until the conclusion of this case. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 12/16/2013. (LMF)
December 31, 2013 58 Featured Case ORDER re 56 Notice (Other) filed by PNC Bank, N.A. Plaintiff shall have up to and including January 3, 2014, to submit a stipulation of dismissal of Count III against Parker Commons. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 12/31/2013. (LMF)
January 3, 2014 61 Featured Case ORDER dismissing case re 59 Notice (Other). Count III of Plaintiff's Verified Amended Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to the Stipulated Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Count III of the Amended Verified Complaint as to Parker Commons Office Park Condominium Association Inc. 59 , with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Judgment is further entered in favor of Plaintiff against Defendant Parker Commons as to Count II of the Amended Verifie d Complaint pursuant to this Court's Order at Doc. 57 This matter against Defendant Unknown Occupants is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs pursuant to this Court's Order at Doc. 54 The Clerk of the Court is directed to amend the judgment that was previously entered at Doc. 51 accordingly, terminate any pending motions and deadlines, and CLOSE the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 1/3/2014. (LMF)
April 3, 2014 68 Featured Case ORDER granting 67 Plaintiff's Motion to Schedule Foreclosure Sale. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 4/3/2014. (BLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: PNC Bank, N.A. v. DBAK Holdings, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Stephenie Biernacki Anthony
Represented By: John A. Anthony
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DBAK Holdings, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna H. Keller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brant Keller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Commons Office Park Condominium Association Inc.
Represented By: Lori L. Moore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Occupants
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]