Smith et al v. Bulls-Hit Ranch and Farm, Inc. et al

Defendant: Thomas R. Lee, Ronald Uzzle and Bulls-Hit Ranch and Farm, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dennis Nash and Leroy Smith
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00449
Filed: April 23, 2012
 
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Jacksonville Office
County: St. Johns
Referring Judge: Thomas E. Morris
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
 
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 motion to amend/correct; granting 12 Motion for joinder. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E. Morris on 10/18/2012. (DLC)
May 17, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 53 Brief - Plaintiff filed by Leroy Smith, Alfonso Grant, Dennis Nash in response to the Court's inquiries. See order for directions to Clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E. Morris on 5/17/2013. (DLC)
June 17, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 35 Report and Recommendations.; granting 18 Motion for Settlement. The Agreement of Settlement and Release is approved. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice as to all claims, individual and potential class action, between Plainitss Smith, Nash and Grant and Defendants lee and Bulls-Hit, subject to the right of the parties to submit a stipulated form of final order or judgment, or request an extensionof time should they so chose, or for any party to move to reopen upon good cause being shown, within 60 days. After 60 days, and without further order, the dismissal will be deemed with prejudice. Counsel for Plaintiffs are prohibited from withholding any portion of the settlement amounts under the settlement agreement pursuant to a contigent fee agreement or otherwise.. Signed by Senior Judge William J. Castagna on 6/14/2013. (RT)
July 23, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 65 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 41 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment Against Defendant Ronald Uzzle filed by Leroy Smith, Alfonso Grant, Dennis Nash. The Joint motion for approval of settlement and entry of stipulated final judgment is granted in part. Plainitffs' counsel is prohibited from withholding any portion of the settlement amounts payable to Plaintiffs Smith, Nash, Grant and Williams under the settlement agreements pursuant to a contingent fee agreement or otherwise. Signed by Senior Judge William J. Castagna on 7/23/2013. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Smith et al v. Bulls-Hit Ranch and Farm, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas R. Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Uzzle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bulls-Hit Ranch and Farm, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Nash
Represented By: Gregory Scott Schell
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Smith
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Gregory Scott Schell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]