Dish Network L.L.C. v. TV Net Solutions, LLC et al

Defendant: Omar Raheem, TV Net Solutions, LLC and Mohammad Mustafa
Plaintiff: Dish Network L.L.C.
Case Number: 6:2012cv01629
Filed: October 31, 2012
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Orlando Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John Antoon
Referring Judge: Thomas B. Smith
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Motion requiring defense counsel to confer regarding outstanding discovery issues. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 5/21/2013. (Smith, Thomas)
August 12, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion to Compel discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 8/12/2013. (Smith, Thomas)
September 10, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing public filing re 73 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 9/10/2014. (SMW)
October 2, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 80 Motion to seal information ; granting 82 Motion for Extension of Time to File redacted documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 10/2/2014. (Smith, Thomas)
November 25, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 73 Motion for Default Judgment; Granting in part 79 Motion for judgment; Count IV of the Amended Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Adopting Report and Recommendations re 86 Report and Recommendations. The Clerk is directed to enter a judgment in favor of Dish Network L.L.C. and against the following Defendants jointly and severally in the amount of $956,649.00: Global Satellit IP TV Scandinavian AB and Basem Halabi. After entry of judgment, the Clerk shall close this case. This Court retains jurisdiction over this action to enforce the permanent injunction provided in this Order. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 11/25/2014. (DJD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dish Network L.L.C. v. TV Net Solutions, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Raheem
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TV Net Solutions, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammad Mustafa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dish Network L.L.C.
Represented By: Joseph H. Boyle
Represented By: James A. Boatman, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]