Porter, et al v. Chrysler Group LLC

Plaintiff: Robert Charles Justin Porter and Eva Andrea Porter
Defendant: Chrysler Group LLC.
Case Number: 6:2013cv00555
Filed: April 5, 2013
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Orlando Office
County: Brevard
Referring Judge: Gregory J. Kelly
Presiding Judge: Roy B. Dalton
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 28 motion to dismiss. Plaintiffs have leave to file a second amended complaint on or before Wednesday, August 14, 2013. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/25/2013. (VMF)
December 19, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant Chrysler Group LLC's Motion [to] Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay Case and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Doc. 48) is DENIED IN PART AND TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT IN PART; denying 58 emergency motion to stay. On or before Monday, January 6, 2014, Defendant is DIRECTED to file a supplemental brief. On or before Thursday, January 23, 2014, Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to respond to Defendant's supplemental brief. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/19/2013. (VMF)
December 27, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 42 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/27/2013. (LLM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter, et al v. Chrysler Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Charles Justin Porter
Represented By: Adam T. Rabin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Andrea Porter
Represented By: Adam T. Rabin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrysler Group LLC.
Represented By: Robert M. Fulton
Represented By: Lara J. Tibbals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.