Bicycle Peddler, LLC v. Doe 35

Plaintiff: Bicycle Peddler, LLC
Defendant: Doe 35
Case Number: 6:2013cv00595
Filed: April 11, 2013
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Orlando Office
County: Seminole
Referring Judge: Thomas B. Smith
Presiding Judge: Roy B. Dalton
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion to extend time to serve Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 8/12/2013. (Smith, Thomas)
October 31, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion to extend time to amend complaint and serve defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 10/31/2013. (Smith, Thomas)
April 18, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 motion for expedited discovery to identify Doe 35. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/18/2013. (Smith, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bicycle Peddler, LLC v. Doe 35
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bicycle Peddler, LLC
Represented By: Richard E. Fee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 35
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]