Mainsail Development, LLC et al v. Rusco Investments, Inc. et al

Defendant: Pinnacle Mutual, Inc., Lass Accounting & Business Services, Inc., Julie Holden, Ruth Liverpool, Aldwyn Liverpool and Rusco Investments, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mainsail Development, LLC and Austin Park Development, LLC
Case Number: 8:2011cv00045
Filed: January 6, 2011
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Tampa Office
County: Hillsborough
Presiding Judge: Virginia M. Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Anthony E. Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 17 Report and Recommendation; granting 4 Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration; denying as moot 16 Defendants' Motion to Stay Any Obligation to Answer or Otherwise Respond. The case is STAYED and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED pending the resolution of the arbitration proceedings. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/19/2011. (CR)
July 20, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants Ruth and Aldwyn Liverpool's Motion for Extension of Time to Comply 46 , construed as a Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Default, is DENIED. Plaintiffs are directed to file a Motion for Final Default Judgment forthwith. Failu re to file such motion by July 30, 2012, may result in the dismissal of this action. No extensions of time will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/20/2012. (KAK)
August 17, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Final Default Judgment 56 is GRANTED.The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendants in the amount of $1,211,681.10. The Clerk shall thereafter CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/17/2012. (MEB)
October 29, 2012 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant Ruth Liverpool's 65 construed motion to set aside the final default judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/29/2012. (MEB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mainsail Development, LLC et al v. Rusco Investments, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Mutual, Inc.
Represented By: Gary R. Shendell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lass Accounting & Business Services, Inc.
Represented By: Gary R. Shendell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Holden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Liverpool
Represented By: Gary R. Shendell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldwyn Liverpool
Represented By: Gary R. Shendell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rusco Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Gary R. Shendell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mainsail Development, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Lee Hixson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Park Development, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Lee Hixson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]