Erben v. Raymond James European Holdings, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Salih Haluk Erben
Defendant: Raymond James European Holdings, Inc., Raymond James International Holdings, Inc. and Raymond James Financial, Inc.
Mediator: Peter J. Grilli
 
Case Number: 8:2011cv00933
Filed: April 27, 2011
 
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Tampa Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Anthony E. Porcelli
Presiding Judge: Steven D. Merryday
 
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2013 115 Featured Case ORDER denying 82 --motion for partial summary judgment; granting in part and denying in part 83 --motion for summary judgment; directing the Clerk to ENTER JUDGMENT in favor of the defendants and against the plaintiff on counts one, two, and three. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 6/3/2013. (BK)
June 30, 2011 34 Featured Case ORDER granting 26 --motion to dismiss; amended complaint due 7/14/2011. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 6/30/2011. (BK)
February 15, 2013 76 Featured Case ORDER granting 59 --motion to dismiss; Bedford and Critchlow are no longer parties to this action; denying 58 --motion to dismiss; amended case management report due 2/22/2013 for any unexpired deadline. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/15/2013. (BK)
May 20, 2013 94 Featured Case ORDER directing each party to submit by NOON, 5/28/2013 a supplement of five or fewer pages discussing the attributes of a Turkish "joint stock company" and whether the liability of a shareholder in a Turkish "joint stock company" is limited to the amount of the shareholder's investment. Each party must attach as an exhibit the "relevant materials or sources." Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/20/2013. (BK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Erben v. Raymond James European Holdings, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salih Haluk Erben
Represented By: Barry Mark Kazan
Represented By: Robert Paul Johnson
Represented By: Jenay E. Iurato
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond James European Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Edward Di Domenico
Represented By: Joseph C. Coates, III
Represented By: Bradford D. Kaufman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond James International Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph C. Coates, III
Represented By: Timothy Edward Di Domenico
Represented By: Bradford D. Kaufman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond James Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph C. Coates, III
Represented By: Timothy Edward Di Domenico
Represented By: Bradford D. Kaufman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Peter J. Grilli
Represented By: Peter John Grilli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]