Operating Systems Solutions, LLC v. Apple, Inc. Featured Case

Apple was sued for patent infringement by Florida-based Operating Systems Solutions, LLC, alleging that its "Method for Quick Booting an OS" was infringed by the Cupertino, California company.

Plaintiff: Operating Systems Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2011cv01754
Filed: August 5, 2011
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Tampa Office
County: Nassau
Referring Judge: Thomas G. Wilson
Presiding Judge: James S. Moody
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2012 37 Featured Case ORDER denying 25 Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 1/30/2012. (LN)
January 18, 2012 36 REPLY to response to motion re 25 MOTION to transfer case Venue filed by Apple, Inc.. (Tibbals, Lara)
January 13, 2012 35 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 34 Motion for leave to file reply memorandum. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 1/13/2012. (LN)
January 13, 2012 34 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file a Reply Memorandum to Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Transfer Venue by Apple, Inc.. (Tibbals, Lara)
January 12, 2012 33 AFFIDAVIT of James Longacre re: 31 Response to motion to transfer venue by Operating Systems Solutions, LLC. (Berenato, Joseph) Modified text on 1/13/2012 (DMS).
January 12, 2012 32 AFFIDAVIT of Matthew W. Stavish re: 31 Response to motion transfer venue by Operating Systems Solutions, LLC. (Berenato, Joseph) Modified text on 1/13/2012 (DMS).
January 12, 2012 31 RESPONSE to motion re 25 MOTION to transfer case Venue filed by Operating Systems Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1, # 2 Exhibit No. 2, # 3 Exhibit No. 3, # 4 Exhibit No. 4, # 5 Exhibit No. 5, # 6 Exhibit No. 6, # 7 Exhibit No. 7)(Berenato, Joseph) Modified text on 1/13/2012 (DMS).
January 11, 2012 30 **TERMINATED. COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO REFILE WITH APPROPRIATE EVENT CODES AND ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE.**RESPONSE in opposition re 25 MOTION to transfer case Venue filed by Operating Systems Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Longacre Declaration, # 2 Affidavit Stavish Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Stavish Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Stavish Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Stavish Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Stavish Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Stavish Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Stavish Declaration, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Stavish Declaration)(Berenato, Joseph) Modified on 1/12/2012 (DMS).
January 10, 2012 29 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Sherrill L. Jackson (SJ)
January 10, 2012 28 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 12/15/11 before Judge James S. Moody, Jr. Court Reporter Sherrill L. Jackson, RPR, FPR,Telephone number 813/301-5041. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 1/31/2012, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/10/2012, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/9/2012. (SJ)
December 28, 2011 Sealed document S-1. (DMS)
December 28, 2011 27 DECLARATION of Joel Podolny re 25 MOTION to transfer case Venue by Apple, Inc.. (Tibbals, Lara)
December 28, 2011 26 DECLARATION of Eric Syu re 25 MOTION to transfer case Venue by Apple, Inc.. (Tibbals, Lara)
December 28, 2011 25 MOTION to transfer case Venue by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-6, # 2 Exhibit 7, # 3 Exhibit 8-14)(Tibbals, Lara)
December 28, 2011 24 RESPONSE re 20 Answer to complaintCounterclaim of Apple Inc. filed by Operating Systems Solutions, LLC. (MacIsaac, Stephen)
December 27, 2011 23 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 22 Defendant's Motion to seal certain portions of the deposition transcript of OSS's 30(b)(6) witness, James Longacre, as an exhibit to its Motion to Transfer Venue, as well as the Motion itself. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 12/27/2011. (LN)
December 23, 2011 22 Joint MOTION for leave to file under seal and Incorporated Memo by All Parties. (Tibbals, Lara)
December 19, 2011 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple, Inc.. (Tibbals, Lara)
December 19, 2011 20 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Operating Systems Solutions, LLC by Apple, Inc..(Tibbals, Lara)
December 15, 2011 19 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge James S. Moody, Jr.: TELEPHONIC PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 12/15/2011. Court Reporter: Sherrill L. Jackson (SMB)
December 12, 2011 18 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for THURSDAY, 12/15/2011 at 10:30 AM before Judge James S. Moody Jr. shall be held by TELEPHONE. ** Parties shall contact Plaintiff's counsel Stephen MacIsaac to make arrangements to participate in a conference call to Chambers at the time of the scheduling hearing. ** Time reserved: 15 minutes. (LN)
December 9, 2011 17 NOTICE OF HEARING: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for THURSDAY, 12/15/2011 at 10:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge James S. Moody Jr. Time reserved: 15 minutes. (LN)
December 1, 2011 16 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Model Order)(Tibbals, Lara)
December 1, 2011 15 **TERMINATED. REFILED WITH EXHIBIT AT DOC. 16.**CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Tibbals, Lara) Modified on 12/2/2011 (DMS).
November 15, 2011 14 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 13 Motion for extension of time to answer or respond. Apple, Inc. answer due 12/19/2011. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 11/15/2011. (LN)
November 14, 2011 13 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead re 1 Complaint by Apple, Inc.. (Tibbals, Lara)
November 10, 2011 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney James R. Batchelder appearing on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Filing fee $10 receipt number TPA8210.) (JNB)
November 8, 2011 12 Featured Case ORDER granting James R. Batchelder's 9 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting Ching-Lee Fukuda's 10 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting Eric T. Syu's 11 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 11/8/2011. (CAW)
November 7, 2011 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Ching-Lee Fukuda appearing on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Filing fee $10 receipt number TPA8210.) (JNB)
November 7, 2011 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Eric T. Syu appearing on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Filing fee $10 receipt number TPA8210.) (JNB)
November 7, 2011 11 Unopposed MOTION for Eric T. Syu to appear pro hac vice by Apple, Inc.. (Tibbals, Lara) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
November 7, 2011 10 Unopposed MOTION for Ching-Lee Fukuda to appear pro hac vice by Apple, Inc.. (Tibbals, Lara) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
November 7, 2011 9 Unopposed MOTION for James R. Batchelder to appear pro hac vice by Apple, Inc.. (Tibbals, Lara) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
November 3, 2011 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Casey G. Reeder on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Reeder, Casey)
November 3, 2011 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lara J. Tibbals on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Tibbals, Lara)
October 24, 2011 6 Summons issued as to Apple, Inc. (DMS)
August 30, 2011 5 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 4 motion to appear pro hac vice as to JOSEPH W. BERENATO, III, and MATTHEW W. STAVISH. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 8/30/2011. (LN)
August 29, 2011 4 Unopposed MOTION for Joseph W. Berenato and Matthew W. Stavish to appear pro hac vice by Operating Systems Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consent; Designation, # 2 Exhibit Attorney Cert. Forms)(MacIsaac, Stephen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
August 15, 2011 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 8/15/2011. (SMB)
August 5, 2011 2 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 1) (LYB)
August 5, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number TPA-6633) filed by Operating Systems Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LYB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Operating Systems Solutions, LLC v. Apple, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Systems Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Joseph W. Berenato, III
Represented By: Stephen J. MacIsaac
Represented By: Matthew W. Stavish
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]