Rienzo v. Commissioner of Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Mariann May Rienzo
Case Number: 8:2013cv00516
Filed: February 25, 2013
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Tampa Office
County: Polk
Presiding Judge: Susan C Bucklew
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER reversing the Commissioner's final decision and remanding this matter with instructions; Clerk to enter judgment accordingly and close the file. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 3/28/2014. (KAW)
March 31, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Mariann May Rienzo against Commissioner of Social Security. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/31/2014. (JNB)
July 23, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Mariann May Rienzo against Commissioner of Social Security. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/23/2014. (JNB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rienzo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariann May Rienzo
Represented By: Nora Leto
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]