Gilberti v. Welling et al

Plaintiff: Nancy Gilberti
Defendant: Nancy Welling and David Welling
Case Number: 8:2013cv00821
Filed: April 1, 2013
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Tampa Office
County: Pinellas
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A. Jenkins
Presiding Judge: James S. Moody
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 28, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 9 is denied. Defendants' Motions for Sanction for Professional Misconduct 15 17 are denied. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 10/28/2013. (LN)
November 6, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 13 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 11/6/2013. (LN)
December 17, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants' Motion for Sanctions for Professional Misconduct 20 is DENIED. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 12/17/2013. (LN)
January 15, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. Any pending motions are denied as moot. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 1/15/2014. (LN)
July 8, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants' answer 4 is STRICKEN. Defendants shall file an answer that complies with Rule 8(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure within 14 days. Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 5 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 7/8/2013. (LN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilberti v. Welling et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Gilberti
Represented By: Ryan Christopher Hasanbasic
Represented By: Paul R. Fowkes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Welling
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Welling
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]