Laing v. BP, P.L.C. et al

Plaintiff: John Laing
Defendant: BP, P.L.C., BP Exploration & Production, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc. and BP America, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2013cv01041
Filed: April 19, 2013
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Tampa Office
County: Hillsborough
Presiding Judge: Steven D. Merryday
Referring Judge: Thomas G. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 and 27 --motions to dismiss; dismissing the complaint without prejudice; amended complaint due 2/10/2014. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/23/2014. (BK)
July 22, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying in part 48 --motion to dismiss. No later than 8/4/2014 Laing and BP may each brief whether to transfer under Section 1404(a). Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 7/22/2014. (BK)
August 14, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER transferring the action to the Houston Division of the Southern District of Texas. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/14/2014. (BK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laing v. BP, P.L.C. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Laing
Represented By: Louis Daniel Lazaro
Represented By: Clifton Conrad Curry, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP, P.L.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Products North America, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]