The Estate of Juanita Amelia Jackson v. Sandnes et al
Plaintiff: |
The Estate of Juanita Amelia Jackson |
Defendant: |
Michael Sandnes, Alan M. Grochal, Tydings & Rosenberg, LLP, General Electric Capital Corporation, GTCR Golder Rauner, LLC, GTCR Fund VI, L.P., GTCR Partners VI, L.P., Ventas Realty, Limited Partnership and Ventas, Inc. |
Case Number: |
8:2013cv01133 |
Filed: |
April 26, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Florida |
Office: |
Tampa Office |
County: |
Hillsborough |
Presiding Judge: |
Virginia M. Hernandez Covington |
Presiding Judge: |
Mark A. Pizzo |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 28, 2015 |
Filing
136
ORDER denying 131 Motion for Reconsideration. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/28/2015. (KAK)
|
April 8, 2014 |
Filing
124
ORDER: The Jackson Estate's Motion to Stay Proceedings 109 is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to STAY and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE THIS CASE. The parties are directed to file a status report on June 30, 2014, and every 90 days thereafter. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 4/8/2014. (KAK)
|
February 13, 2014 |
Filing
101
ORDER: Plaintiff's Expedited Motion to Extend Time to File an Amended Complaint 95 is GRANTED to the extent that Plaintiff has until and including February 21, 2014, to file its Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/13/2014. (KAK)
|
February 3, 2014 |
Filing
94
ORDER: Defendants GTCR Fund VI, L.P.; GTCR Golden Rauner, LLC; and GTCR Partners VI, L.P.'s Motion to Dismiss 32 is GRANTED. The Complaint is dismissed without prejudice and with leave to amend by February 14, 2014, if the Jackson Estate so chooses. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/3/2014. (KAK)
|
November 14, 2013 |
Filing
82
ORDER denying 66 Defendant Michael Sandnes's Motion to Quash Insufficient Service of Process. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/14/2013. (KAK)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: The Estate of Juanita Amelia Jackson v. Sandnes et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: The Estate of Juanita Amelia Jackson |
Represented By: |
Joanna M. Greber |
Represented By: |
Bennie Lazzara, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Isaac R. Ruiz-Carus |
Represented By: |
James L. Wilkes, II |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Michael Sandnes |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Alan M. Grochal |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Tydings & Rosenberg, LLP |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: General Electric Capital Corporation |
Represented By: |
Carol A. Licko |
Represented By: |
James C. Valenti |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: GTCR Golder Rauner, LLC |
Represented By: |
Jeffrey Carter Andersen |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: GTCR Fund VI, L.P. |
Represented By: |
Jeffrey Carter Andersen |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: GTCR Partners VI, L.P. |
Represented By: |
Jeffrey Carter Andersen |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Ventas Realty, Limited Partnership |
Represented By: |
Hunter Wyman Carroll |
Represented By: |
Caroline A. Lindsey |
Represented By: |
A. Lamar Matthews, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Daniel J. Weiss |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Ventas, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Hunter Wyman Carroll |
Represented By: |
A. Lamar Matthews, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?