WOODHULL v. MASCARELLA

Plaintiff: ANGELA WOODHULL
Defendant: SHIRLEY MASCARELLA
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv00151
Filed: July 16, 2008
 
Court: Florida Northern District Court
Office: Gainesville Office
County: Alachua
Referring Judge: ALLAN KORNBLUM
Presiding Judge: STEPHAN P MICKLE
 
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2008 14 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Incorporated Memorandum of Law and Local Rule 7.1(B) Certificate of Conferral filed by SHIRLEY MASCARELLA : It is recommended that Defendants Motion to Dismiss (doc. 10 ) be DENIED, but without prejudice to again so move if an amended pleading fails to correct the deficiencies herein noted. This cause should be remanded to the undersigned for further proceedings to include a deadline for the filing of an amended complaint and entry of a scheduling order. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ALLAN KORNBLUM on 12/03/2008. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 12/31/2008. (kdm)
December 18, 2008 16 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION granting 14 Report and Recommendation; and DENYING 10 Motion to Dismiss w/o prejudice filed by SHIRLEY MASCARELLA. Case is referred to magistrate judge for further proceedings. Signed by JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 12/18/2008. (jws)
March 19, 2009 26 Featured Case SECOND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 20 Second MOTION to Dismiss filed by SHIRLEY MASCARELLA : It is recommended that Defendants Second Motion to Dismiss (doc. 20 ) be GRANTED, and this cause DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ALLAN KORNBLUM on 3/19/2009. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 4/16/2009. (kdm)
June 24, 2009 28 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 26 Report and Recommendation; GRANTING 20 Motion to Dismiss filed by SHIRLEY MASCARELLA ; TERMINATING 17 Motion for Discovery filed by ANGELA WOODHULL. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 6/24/2009. This case is dismissed for lack of federal jurisdiction. The dismissal does not prevent Plaintiff from pursuing her claims in state court. (kdm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: WOODHULL v. MASCARELLA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA WOODHULL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHIRLEY MASCARELLA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]