UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BAXLEY, II et al

Defendant: SANDRA G BAXLEY and MILTON H BAXLEY, II
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00038
Filed: February 22, 2013
 
Court: Florida Northern District Court
Office: Gainesville Office
County: Alachua
Referring Judge: GARY R JONES
Presiding Judge: STEPHAN P MICKLE
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Defendant's 5 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Defendant shall file an answer to the Complaint within fourteen (14) days of this order. (Answer due by 7/16/2013). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/2/2013. (sdw)
December 30, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 37 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim (doc. 29 ) is GRANTED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/30/2013. (sdw)
May 1, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Report and Recommendation (doc. 53 ) is adopted as the Order of the Court and incorporated by reference herein. The United States' Motion for Summary Judgment (doc. 39 ) is GRANTED. The United States is entitled to judgment against Defendant Milton H. Baxley II for outstanding tax liabilities in the sum of $1,515,408.19 as of December 5, 2013, plus further interest and statutory additions that continue to accrue as a matter of law. The United States is also entitled to foreclose on the tax liens and sell the Subject Property, which is located in Alachua County, at 4610 N.W. 13th Avenue, Gainesville, Florida. Defendant Milton H. Baxley II's Motion for Summary Judgment (doc. 43 ) is DENIED. The United States shall submit a proposed final judgment within fourteen (14) days. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/30/2014. (Proposed Final Judgment Deadline - by 5/14/2014.) (sdw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BAXLEY, II et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDRA G BAXLEY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MILTON H BAXLEY, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: MARA A STRIER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]