KRATT ET AL v. BURNS ET AL

Defendant: JEFFREY AND DEBORAH BURNS, DEBORAH BURNS, DONALD RUTLAND, JUDITH RUTLAND, BROWN FINANCIAL LLC, RUTLAND COMPANY, RUTLAND RESORT PROPERTIES and REGIONS BANK
Plaintiff: FRED & PEGGY KRATT and PEGGY KRATT
 
Case Number: 3:2008cv00464
Filed: October 14, 2008
 
Court: Florida Northern District Court
Office: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending Office
County: Walton
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Presiding Judge: ROGER VINSON
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2008 18 Featured Case ORDER re 16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, 17 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by REGIONS BANK - Pltfs shall respond to deft REGIONS BANK'S motion within TWENTY (20) DAYS from docketing this order. Response to motion due by 12/2/2008. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on November 12, 2008.(cc: F Kratt, P Kratt) (cbj)
December 11, 2008 27 Featured Case ORDER (Of Deficiency) - re Plaintiff Peggy Kratt's Letter to the Clerk of the Court (rec'd 12/9/2008) - Clerk shall file document, but no further pleadings will be accepted unless they comply with the FRCivP and the LR of the NDFL. Additionally, Clerk shall modify docket to reflect pltf Peggy Kratt's new address: 39 Bay Circle Drive, Santa Rosa Beach, FL 32549. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on December 11, 2008.(cc: P.Kratt, F.Kratt) (cbj)
December 16, 2008 33 Featured Case ORDER - re 29 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by REGIONS BANK, and 31 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by RUTLAND COMPANY, RUTLAND RESORT PROPERTIES, JEFFREY BURNS, DONALD RUTLAND, JUDITH R UTLAND - Pltfs shall respond to defendants' motions to dismiss within TWENTY (20) DAYS of docketing date of this order. Response to motions due by 1/5/2009. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on December 16, 2008.(cc: F.Kratt, P.Kratt) (cbj)
July 2, 2009 43 Featured Case ORDER - Motions to Dismiss the initial complaint (docs 12 , 16 ) are Denied as moot. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 29 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by REGIONS BANK, 31 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Compl aint filed by RUTLAND COMPANY, RUTLAND RESORT PROPERTIES, JEFFREY BURNS, DONALD RUTLAND, JUDITH RUTLAND, 19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by PEGGY KRATT, FRED KRATT - - It is recommended - 1. Tha t the motions to dismiss (doc. 29 , 31 ) be Granted and this cause as to all Defendants be Dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Dismissal of the federal claims should be with prejudice. Dismissal of the state law claims should be wi thout prejudice. 2. That the motion for preliminary injunctive relief (doc. 19 ) be Denied as moot. 3. That the clerk be directed to Close this case. R&R flag set - Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 7/30/2009. . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on July 2, 2009. (cbj)
August 14, 2009 49 Featured Case ORDER - Adopting 43 Report and Recommendation. - The motions to dismiss 29 filed by REGIONS BANK, and 31 filed by RUTLAND COMPANY, RUTLAND RESORT PROPERTIES, JEFFREY BURNS, DONALD RUTLAND, JUDITH RUTLAND, are Granted and thi s cause as to all Defendants is Dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Dismissal of the federal claims shall be with prejudice. Dismissal of the state law claims shall be without prejudice. - Plaintiffs' 19 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive relief is Denied as moot. - The clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on August 14, 2009. (cbj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: KRATT ET AL v. BURNS ET AL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY AND DEBORAH BURNS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBORAH BURNS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD RUTLAND
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDITH RUTLAND
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROWN FINANCIAL LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUTLAND COMPANY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUTLAND RESORT PROPERTIES
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REGIONS BANK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRED & PEGGY KRATT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEGGY KRATT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]