PROCTOR v. COUNTRYWIDE FINANCIAL CORPORATION et al

Plaintiff: FRED PROCTOR
Defendant: COUNTRYWIDE FINANCIAL CORPORATION, COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC, BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING LP, LARRY WRIGHT, WRIGHT & ASSOCIATES OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA INC, CHRISTOPHER LEE PEAVY, JAMES A PEAVY, JR, ANDREW PICKEL and PEAVY AND ASSOCIATES INC
Case Number: 3:2010cv00149
Filed: May 7, 2010
Court: Florida Northern District Court
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Walton
Presiding Judge: RICHARD SMOAK
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 20, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Discovery deadline extended to 11/19/2010. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 10/20/2010. (sea)
December 17, 2010 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plas claims against Defendant Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. &BAC Home Loan Servicing, LP are dismissed with prejudice. Dft Countrywide Home Loans, Incs Counterclaim against Pla is dismissed with prejudice. The parties shall bear their respective costs and attorneys fees. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 12/27/2010. (sea)
January 11, 2011 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as untimely 67 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 1/11/2011. (jcw)
March 23, 2011 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The Order 65 is vacated. This case, which consists of Pla's claims against Dfts Larry A Wright & Wright & Associates of Northwest Florida, Inc, is reinstated on the active docket of the court. Jury Trial set for 6/20/2011 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Pensacola before JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 3/23/2011. (sea)
June 13, 2011 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 84 Motion to Remand to State Court. 1. This case is remanded to the Circuit Court of the First Judicial Circuit for Walton County, Florida. 2. The clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 6/13/2011. (cc: Walton County Circuit Court) (jcw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PROCTOR v. COUNTRYWIDE FINANCIAL CORPORATION et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRED PROCTOR
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTRYWIDE FINANCIAL CORPORATION
Represented By: MARK DAVID SCHELLHASE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC
Represented By: MARK DAVID SCHELLHASE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING LP
Represented By: MARK DAVID SCHELLHASE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LARRY WRIGHT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WRIGHT & ASSOCIATES OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA INC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER LEE PEAVY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES A PEAVY, JR
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW PICKEL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEAVY AND ASSOCIATES INC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]