COMMUNITY MARITIME PARK ASSOCIATES INC v. MARITIME PARK DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS LLC

Plaintiff: COMMUNITY MARITIME PARK ASSOCIATES INC
Defendant: MARITIME PARK DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS LLC
Counter_claimant: MARITIME PARK DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS LLC
Counter_defendant: COMMUNITY MARITIME PARK ASSOCIATES INC
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00060
Filed: February 4, 2011
 
Court: Florida Northern District Court
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Referring Judge: CHARLES J KAHN
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2013 321 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 317 Motion by stipulation of the plaintiff. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on January 22, 2013. (aow)
January 22, 2013 322 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on viability of counterclaim. Defendant's renewed request to proceed on Prompt Payment Act Counterclaim is DENIED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on January 22, 2013. (aow)
February 4, 2014 368 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on February 4, 2014. (aow)
March 14, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Defendant's 20 Amended Motion for Recusal is DENIED. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on March 14, 2011. (pmc)
July 14, 2011 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 37 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on July 14, 2011. (pmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: COMMUNITY MARITIME PARK ASSOCIATES INC v. MARITIME PARK DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY MARITIME PARK ASSOCIATES INC
Represented By: RANDALL TODD HARRIS
Represented By: EDWARD P FLEMING
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARITIME PARK DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS LLC
Represented By: GEORGE RODERICK MEAD, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: MARITIME PARK DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS LLC
Represented By: GEORGE RODERICK MEAD, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: COMMUNITY MARITIME PARK ASSOCIATES INC
Represented By: EDWARD P FLEMING
Represented By: RANDALL TODD HARRIS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]