IN RE: SEASIDE ENGINEERING & SURVEYING INC

Trustee: US TRUSTEE
Claimant: SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00511
Filed: October 24, 2012
 
Court: Florida Northern District Court
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Alachua
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
 
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101 Bankruptcy
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2014 69 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 67 MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION. Appeal No. 13-15139-C. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/21/2014. (dlt)
January 24, 2014 71 Featured Case ORDER ON APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUBSTANTIVE ADJUDICATION OF APPEAL - The Motion is 70 GRANTED inasmuch as this Court will issue a ruling in due time. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/24/2014. (dlt)
March 27, 2014 74 Featured Case ORDER AFFIRMING BANKRUPTCY COURTS ORDER CONFIRMING AMENDED PLAN OF REORGANIZATION OF SEASIDE ENGINEERING & SURVEYING, INC. AS MODIFIED BY THE TECHNICAL AMENDMENT TO THE AMENDED PLAN - The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 3/27/2014. (dlt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: IN RE: SEASIDE ENGINEERING & SURVEYING INC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: US TRUSTEE
Represented By: JASON HOWARD EGAN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLC
Represented By: THEODORE RANDOLPH HOWELL
Represented By: RICHARD MARK GAAL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]