LOPEZ v. ML #3 LLC

Plaintiff: FRANCISCO LOPEZ and DANIELLE SILVANO
Defendant: ML #3 LLC
 
Case Number: 4:2011cv00136
Filed: April 6, 2011
 
Court: Florida Northern District Court
Office: Tallahassee Office
County: Leon
Presiding Judge: RICHARD SMOAK
Referring Judge: WILLIAM C SHERRILL
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re 6 MOTION for leave to file second Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs shall file second amended complaint by 5/25/2011, and Defendant shall have 14 days to respond. 8 M OTION for Leave to File re 7 Response in Opposition to Motion Reply is DENIED AS MOOT. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/8/2011)., Amended Pleadings due by 5/25/2011.). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 5/23/2011. (jws)
June 16, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denied 19 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Mediation. The response deadline for the Motion to Dismiss 16 shall be extended until 7/5/2011. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 6/16/2011. (sea)
July 7, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 16 Dft's Motion to Dismiss. Plas' Second Amended Complaint 14 is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 7/7/2011. (sea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: LOPEZ v. ML #3 LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCO LOPEZ
Represented By: WILLIAM CONRAD BIELECKY
Represented By: DAVID HOWARD ABRAMS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIELLE SILVANO
Represented By: DAVID HOWARD ABRAMS
Represented By: WILLIAM CONRAD BIELECKY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ML #3 LLC
Represented By: DOUGLAS JOHN LAPOINTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]