SCOTT v. GOOGLE INC Featured Case

Defendant: GOOGLE INC
Plaintiff: BRENT MATTHEW SCOTT
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00614
Filed: November 29, 2012
 
Court: Florida Northern District Court
Office: Tallahassee Office
County: Leon
Presiding Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Referring Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 9, 2013 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT re 13 Electronic Case Transferred Out to California Northern District, case opened as 5:13-cv-1599. (jws)
April 5, 2013 13 Electronic Interdistrict Transfer to the Northern District of California. (jws)
April 1, 2013 14 MDL ORDER Transferring Case to Northern District of California to Judge Lucy H Koh as MDL No. 2430., (jws)
March 11, 2013 11 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Opposition to GOOGLE INC's Motion for Transfer and Coordination of Related Actions to District Court of Northern District of California. (jws)
March 11, 2013 10 NOTICE of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument filed by US Judicial Panel on MultiDistrict Litigation. (jws)
March 11, 2013 9 NOTICE of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument filed by US Judicial Panel on MultiDistrict Litigation. (jws)
March 8, 2013 12 NOTICE of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument filed by US Judicial Panel on MultiDistrict Litigation. (jws)
March 7, 2013 8 NOTICE of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument filed by US Judicial Panel on MultiDistrict Litigation. (jws)
March 4, 2013 7 NOTICE of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument filed by US Judicial Panel on MultiDistrict Litigation. (jws)
January 23, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS. GRANTING 5 Motion to Stay. Further proceedings are stayed, and all deadlines that have not passed are tolled, until the earlier of (1) entry of an order transferring this case to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation or (2) 14 days after entry of an order denying transfer. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 1/23/2013. (pll)
January 22, 2013 5 Joint MOTION to Stay of Proceedings Pending Ruling by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by GOOGLE INC. (PASS, ROBERT)
January 18, 2013 4 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM ELVIN HOPKINS, JR on behalf of BRENT MATTHEW SCOTT (HOPKINS, WILLIAM)
December 6, 2012 3 Summons Issued as to GOOGLE INC. (pll)
December 5, 2012 2 NOTICE of clerk to issue summons by BRENT MATTHEW SCOTT (KENNEDY, CAMERON)
November 29, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 1129-2472199.), filed by Brent Matthew Scott. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KENNEDY, CAMERON)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: SCOTT v. GOOGLE INC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOOGLE INC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENT MATTHEW SCOTT
Represented By: CAMERON MICHAEL KENNEDY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]