GLOBAL COMMUNICATIONS INC v. DIRECTV INC et al

Defendant: DIRECTV GROUP INC and DIRECTV INC
Plaintiff: GLOBAL COMMUNICATIONS INC
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00651
Filed: December 20, 2012
 
Court: Florida Northern District Court
Office: Tallahassee Office
County: Leon
Presiding Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Referring Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2014 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT - GRANTED 103 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Second Amended Complaint filed by FUNAI CORPORATION. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response to second amended complaint not filed earlier: 2/14/2014). Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 2/5/2014. (dlt)
February 11, 2014 119 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ROGATORY TO WISTRON NEWEB CORP. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 2/11/2014. (dlt)
February 11, 2014 120 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ROGATORY TO ZINWELL CORP. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 2/11/2014. (dlt)
February 28, 2014 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT 63 IN PART. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 2/28/14. (sms)
March 5, 2014 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING DIRECTV'S DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO ASC'S CROSSCLAIM.- GRANTING 154 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 128 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim filed by DIRECTV INC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if DirecTV's response not filed earlier: 3/24/2014).) Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 3/5/2014. (dlt)
March 5, 2014 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 153 ZCWC LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS. The reply memorandum is deemed properly filed. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 3/5/2014. (dlt)
April 21, 2014 208 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEYS - GRANTING 205 MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by CALAMP CORP., Attorney LARRY D SIMPSON, EDWARD KENDRICK SMITH, LOUIS TOUTON, KRISTA SUE SCHWARTZ, JAMES P JUDKINS for CALAMP CORP added. Attorney JOEL ANDREW KAUTH terminated. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 4/21/2014. (dlt)
May 16, 2014 222 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JOINT STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 5/16/2014. (dlt)
January 2, 2014 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE FOR SPECIFIC DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT - Granting 93 Joint MOTION to Extend Time in Which to Respond to Second Amended Complaint.(Internal deadline for referral to judge if responses to second amended complaint not filed earlier: 1/17/2014).) Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 1/2/2014. (dlt)
January 10, 2014 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING A DEADLINE FOR A FURTHER 26(f) CONFERENCE - The deadline for a further Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) conference is set as 21 days after issuance of a written order on the pending summary judgment motion. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 1/10/2014. (dlt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: GLOBAL COMMUNICATIONS INC v. DIRECTV INC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECTV GROUP INC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECTV INC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLOBAL COMMUNICATIONS INC
Represented By: MICHAEL J BRICKMAN
Represented By: JAMES C BRADLEY
Represented By: GUY M BURNS
Represented By: NINA H FIELDS
Represented By: JOHN WILEY HORTON
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]