FLEMING v. FLORIDA BAR

Plaintiff: SHANNON FLEMING
Defendant: FLORIDA BAR
Case Number: 4:2013cv00139
Filed: March 25, 2013
Court: Florida Northern District Court
Office: Tallahassee Office
County: Leon
Presiding Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Referring Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING 16 THE DEADLINE TO FILE A SUMMARY-JUDGMENT MOTION.( Dispositive Motions to be filed by 11/19/2013.) Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 11/16/2013. (dlt)
November 16, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING THE MEDIATION DEADLINES - GRANTING 15 Joint MOTION to Extend Time to conduct Mediation filed by FLORIDA BAR. ( Mediation Report due by 12/24/2013.) Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 11/16/2013. (dlt)
December 9, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE FOR THE SUMMARY-JUDGMENT RESPONSE - Granting 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. ( Response to motion due by 12/20/2013.) Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 12/9/2013. (dlt)
January 17, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 19 SUMMARY JUDGMENT - The clerk must enter a judgment dismissing the plaintiff's claims with prejudice. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 1/16/2014. (dlt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FLEMING v. FLORIDA BAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANNON FLEMING
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA BAR
Represented By: KEVIN DAVID JOHNSON
Represented By: THOMAS MARTIN GONZALEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.