L et al v. JACKSON COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD et al

Defendant: GAY WESTBROOK, MARY SUE NEVES, SHAWN LARKIN, JACKSON COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD, LEE MILLER, STEVE BENTON, RICO WILLIAMS and LARRY MOORE
Plaintiff: A L and P L B
Case Number: 5:2013cv00085
Filed: March 26, 2013
Court: Florida Northern District Court
Office: Panama City Office
County: Jackson
Referring Judge: GARY R JONES
Presiding Judge: RICHARD SMOAK
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1401 Education: Handicapped Child Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2014 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 134 Amended Motion for Partial Judgment of the Record and Partial Summary Judgment; denying without prejudice 133 Motion to Admit Additional Evidence; denying as moot 116 MOTION for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings; granting 112 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment. All of Plaintiffs' claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 10/30/2014. (jem)
September 26, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. Plaintiffs may amend their complaint not later than 10/10/2013. If Plaintiffs do not file an amended complaint by 10/10/2013, the Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 9/26/2013. (jem)
March 17, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 MOTION Exclude Additional Evidence. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 3/17/2014. (jem)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L et al v. JACKSON COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GAY WESTBROOK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY SUE NEVES
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAWN LARKIN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACKSON COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEE MILLER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVE BENTON
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICO WILLIAMS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LARRY MOORE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A L
Represented By: ROSEMARY NOBLE PALMER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P L B
Represented By: ROSEMARY NOBLE PALMER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]