Whyte v. United States Postal Service

Plaintiff: Doreen Whyte
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Case Number: 0:2011cv62112
Filed: September 27, 2011
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Office: Ft. Lauderdale Office
County: Broward
Presiding Judge: James I. Cohn
Referring Judge: Barry S. Seltzer
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 25 Motion to Take Deposition for Use at Trial; terminating 29 Motion for Disclosure as this document is not a motion. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 3/21/12. (prd)
April 30, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Motion to Strike Non-Disclosed Witnesses. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 4/30/2012. (prd)
May 31, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 5/31/2012. (sry)
September 25, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 58 Defendant's Motion to Tax Costs. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 9/25/2012. (sry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whyte v. United States Postal Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doreen Whyte
Represented By: Eric Lowell Berger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]