ALL LEISURE HOLIDAYS LIMITED v. NOVELLO et al

Plaintiff: ALL LEISURE HOLIDAYS LIMITED
Defendant: STEVEN NOVELLO and DATABASE MARKETING SOLUTIONS, INC.
 
Case Number: 0:2012cv62328
Filed: November 27, 2012
 
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Office: Ft. Lauderdale Office
County: Broward
Presiding Judge: Robin S. Rosenbaum
Referring Judge: Barry S. Seltzer
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2012 15 Featured Case ORDER granting 14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 12/4/2012. (RSR)
December 6, 2012 18 Featured Case ORDER granting 16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 12/6/2012. (bon)
March 8, 2013 42 Featured Case ORDER requiring parties to file joint discovery plan and scheduling report by 3/15/2013. Please see Order for details. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 3/8/2013. (bon)
November 27, 2012 7 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 4 Plaintiff's Emergency Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Please see Order for details. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 11/29/2012 at 10:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum. Plaintiff is to immediately serve this Order on Defendants and shall file notice with the Court certifying the date of service. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 11/27/2012 at 8:03 PM. (bon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: ALL LEISURE HOLIDAYS LIMITED v. NOVELLO et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL LEISURE HOLIDAYS LIMITED
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Wertman
Represented By: Leonard Keith Samuels
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN NOVELLO
Represented By: James Barker Flanigan
Represented By: Paul Octavio Lopez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DATABASE MARKETING SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Mark Andrew Levy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]