Karhu v. Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Defendant: Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Plaintiff: Adam Karhu
 
Case Number: 0:2013cv60768
Filed: April 3, 2013
 
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Office: Ft Lauderdale Office
County: Broward
Presiding Judge: James I. Cohn
Referring Judge: Barry S. Seltzer
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2014 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 70 Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 3/3/2014. (ns)
March 18, 2014 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 119 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Motions to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Plaintiff's Experts. Please see Order for further details regarding briefing schedule for 116 117 118 Defendant's Motions to Exclude. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 3/18/2014. (ns)
March 27, 2014 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 3/27/2014. (ns)
July 17, 2014 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 143 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Denying Class Certification Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(c)(1)(C); denying 151 Plaintiff's Request for Oral Argument on Its Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Denying Class Certification Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(c)(1)(C). Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 7/17/2014. (ns)
August 9, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff shall file his Second Amended Complaint by no later August 19, 2013. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 8/9/2013. (ams)
August 16, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 Motion to Bifurcate Discovery. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 8/16/2013. (ams)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Karhu v. Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Karhu
Represented By: Scott A Bursor
Represented By: Barry L. Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]