Phillips et al v. M.I. Quality Lawn Maintenance, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Kelly Phillips, Luisa Ginsberg, Cristina Paret and Yahilin Chirino
Defendant: M.I. Quality Lawn Maintenance, Inc., Mitchell's lawn Maintenance Corp. and Mitchell Igelko
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv20698
Filed: March 9, 2010
 
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Office: Miami Office
Presiding Judge: Donald L. Graham
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2012 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING FURTHER CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE SOLORZANO PAYROLL DOCUMENTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton on 7/8/2012. (AMS)
October 21, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 6 Motion to Dismiss State Law Minium Wage Claims, Count II and Count III. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 10/21/2010. (ra)
February 14, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 2/14/2011. (ls)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Phillips et al v. M.I. Quality Lawn Maintenance, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Phillips
Represented By: Jamie H. Zidell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luisa Ginsberg
Represented By: Jamie H. Zidell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristina Paret
Represented By: Jamie H. Zidell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yahilin Chirino
Represented By: Jamie H. Zidell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.I. Quality Lawn Maintenance, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell's lawn Maintenance Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Igelko
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]