Bank of America, N.A. v. Grec Homes IX, LLC et al

Defendant: Maria C. Guerra, Armando Guerra, Rosiel Herran, Agustin Herran, GREC Homes XII, LLC, GREC Homes XI, LLC, GREC Homes X, LLC, GREC Homes IX, LLC, Manuel Herran, Nyria Herran, Emiliano Herran and Mirian Herran
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2013cv21718
Filed: May 13, 2013
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M. Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2014 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 93 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Amended answer and counterclaims due by 2/5/2014; granting in part and denying in part 137 Motion for Extension of Time. The Bank's Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses in granted in part and denied in part. The Bank's Motion to Strike Demand for Jury Trial is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/23/2014. (ps1)
April 10, 2014 182 Opinion or Order of the Court Clawback ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 4/10/2014. (tro)
June 19, 2014 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 156 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 156 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/19/2014. (ps1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Grec Homes IX, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria C. Guerra
Represented By: Victor Manuel Diaz, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armando Guerra
Represented By: Victor Manuel Diaz, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosiel Herran
Represented By: Victor Manuel Diaz, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agustin Herran
Represented By: Victor Manuel Diaz, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREC Homes XII, LLC
Represented By: Victor Manuel Diaz, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREC Homes XI, LLC
Represented By: Victor Manuel Diaz, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREC Homes X, LLC
Represented By: Victor Manuel Diaz, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREC Homes IX, LLC
Represented By: Victor Manuel Diaz, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Herran
Represented By: Victor Manuel Diaz, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nyria Herran
Represented By: Victor Manuel Diaz, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emiliano Herran
Represented By: Victor Manuel Diaz, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mirian Herran
Represented By: Victor Manuel Diaz, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Peter A. Tappert
Represented By: Brian S. Dervishi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]