PHILLIPS v. Jeanes et al

Plaintiff: MICHAEL WADE PHILLIPS
Defendant: J. Jeanes and JOHN DOES
Case Number: 1:2013cv00068
Filed: April 22, 2013
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Albany Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Thomas Q Langstaff
Presiding Judge: W. Louis Sands
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by Judge W. Louis Sands on 6/6/2013. (bcl)
October 7, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 20 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed as to Warden Jeanes. Plaintiff may proceed with his Complaint against Officers Richardson, Curry, and Lewis. Ordered by Judge W. Louis Sands on 10/7/2013. (bcl)
June 27, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rejecting 54 Report and Recommendations. Defendant's objections are sustained. Plaintiff's Second Motion for Leave to Amend his Complaint to add back in Officer Lewis as a defendant is denied. Plaintiff's request is remanded to Judge Langstaff for a frivolity review. Ordered by U.S. District Judge W LOUIS SANDS on 6/27/2014. (bcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PHILLIPS v. Jeanes et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL WADE PHILLIPS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Jeanes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]