GILL et al v. HARTSHORN et al

Defendant: ELM LEASING LLC, JOHN AND OR JANE DOES, Loren C Gill, KEVIN HARTSHORN, DANIEL VANGASKEN, JAY NICHOLS, Eastern Property Development LLC, South East Enterprise Group LLC, EPD 1 HOLDING TRUST, EPD 2 HOLDING TRUST, SEE HOLDING TRUST, CHURCH OF COMPASSIONATE SERVICE and COMPASSIONATE ORDER OF SERVICE OF THE CHURCH OF COMPASSIONATE SERVICE
Plaintiff: KAREN GILL and LAUREN GILL
Case Number: 4:2012cv00077
Filed: April 2, 2012
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: Muscogee
Presiding Judge: Clay D. Land
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2013 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 05/31/2013. (CGC)
December 10, 2013 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 163 Motion for Discovery; denying 133 Motion in Limine; denying 135 Motion in Limine. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Clay D. Land on 12/10/2013. (CGC)
January 3, 2014 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 104 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment to the extent set forth in the Order; denying 105 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 106 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Clay D. Land on 01/03/2014. (CGC)
January 9, 2014 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 162 Motion to Appoint Receiver. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Clay D. Land on 01/09/2014. (CGC)
April 14, 2014 222 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 179 Motion to Void Settlement; granting 201 Motion to Approve Settlement; denying 180 and 209 Motions to Dismiss; granting 176 Motion for Leave to File; granting 199 Motion to Dismiss; terminating 187 , 189 , and 195 Motions in Limine. Ordered by U.S. District Judge CLAY D LAND on 04/14/2014. (CGC)
July 28, 2014 250 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER construing 229 Motion to Bifurcate as Motion to Sever and granting; finding as moot 239 Motion to Bifurcate. Ordered by U.S. District Judge CLAY D LAND on 07/28/2014. (CGC)
September 5, 2014 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 255 Motion in Limine. Ordered by U.S. District Judge CLAY D LAND on 09/05/2014. (CGC)
November 25, 2014 305 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 299 Application for Writ of Garnishment. Ordered by U.S. District Judge CLAY D LAND on 11/25/2014. (CGC)
February 19, 2013 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 Motion to Intervene. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 02/19/2013. (CGC)
March 15, 2013 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 57 Motion to Compel. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 03/15/2013. (CGC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GILL et al v. HARTSHORN et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELM LEASING LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND OR JANE DOES
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loren C Gill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN HARTSHORN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL VANGASKEN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAY NICHOLS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern Property Development LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South East Enterprise Group LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPD 1 HOLDING TRUST
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPD 2 HOLDING TRUST
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEE HOLDING TRUST
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHURCH OF COMPASSIONATE SERVICE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMPASSIONATE ORDER OF SERVICE OF THE CHURCH OF COMPASSIONATE SERVICE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN GILL
Represented By: RICHARD ALLEN CHILDS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAUREN GILL
Represented By: RICHARD ALLEN CHILDS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]