Wilson (Death Penalty) v. Upton

Petitioner: Marion Wilson, Jr
Respondent: Carl Humphrey
Case Number: 5:2010cv00489
Filed: December 17, 2010
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Macon Office
County: Butts
Presiding Judge: Marc Thomas Treadwell
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 1/28/2011. (tlh)
March 4, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Schedule. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 3/4/2011. (tlh)
July 12, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 25 Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery and Authorization of Necessary Expert Services and instructs the parties to comply with the March 4, 2011 scheduling Order for future motions and briefs. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 7/12/2011. (tlh)
July 29, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AMENDING 4 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Court now AMENDS the January 12, 2011 Order to show that Mr. Kammer was appointed effective December 1, 2010. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 07/29/2011. (tlh)
August 26, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 32 Motion to Stay. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 8/26/2011. (tlh)
October 5, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 36 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 10/5/2011. (tlh)
January 12, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and GRANTING 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Brian S. Kammer is appointed to represent Petitioner in his federal habeas corpus action. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 1/12/2011. (tlh)
December 19, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Marion Wilson, Jr. The Court issues a COA on the following issue: Whether trial counsel was ineffective during the penalty phase by failing to conduct a reasonable investigation into mi tigation evidence and by failing to make a reasonable presentation of mitigation evidence. In relation to all other claims, grounds, and issues raised in Wilson's 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, the Court finds the standard shown above for the grant of a COA has not been met. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 12/19/2013. (tlh)
January 12, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading regarding 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Marion Wilson, Jr. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 1/12/2011. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson (Death Penalty) v. Upton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marion Wilson, Jr
Represented By: David James Harth
Represented By: Gabrielle Elizabeth Bina
Represented By: David Edwin Jones
Represented By: Brian S. Kammer
Represented By: Lissa Rose Koop
Represented By: Emily Jane Lee
Represented By: Autumn Noelle Nero
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Carl Humphrey
Represented By: Beth Attaway Burton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]