ESPOSITO (DEATH PENALTY) v. HUMPHREY

Petitioner: JOHN ANTHONY ESPOSITO
Respondent: CARL HUMPHREY
Case Number: 5:2012cv00163
Filed: May 8, 2012
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Macon Office
County: Butts
Presiding Judge: C. Ashley Royal
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 4, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 32 Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery and Authorization and Payment of Necessary Expert Services. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 1/4/13 (lap)
December 10, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by JOHN ANTHONY ESPOSITO. COA issued on the following issue: Whether trial counsel were ineffective in failing to investigate and present evidence to support their defense theories that Esposito was less culpable than Woodward and that his personal history of abuse and mental illness was mitigating. COA denied in relation to all other claims, grounds, and issues raised in Esposito's petition. Ordered by U.S. District Judge C ASHLEY ROYAL on 12/10/14. (lap)
May 18, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by JOHN ANTHONY ESPOSITO. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 5/18/12. (lap)
May 18, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 5/18/2012 (lap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ESPOSITO (DEATH PENALTY) v. HUMPHREY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOHN ANTHONY ESPOSITO
Represented By: Kirsten Salchow
Represented By: BRIAN S KAMMER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CARL HUMPHREY
Represented By: Beth Attaway Burton
Represented By: Richard Tangum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]