FAULCONER v. MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC et al

Plaintiff: NANCY FAULCONER
Defendant: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC, HOME AMERICA MORTGAGE INC, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION and HOMEWARD RESIDENTIAL INC
Case Number: 5:2012cv00246
Filed: June 29, 2012
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Macon Office
County: Putnam
Presiding Judge: Hugh Lawson
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER lifting stay and setting new response times and deadlines. Deadline for discovery is 5/30/2013; deadline for dispositive motions is 7/15/2013. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 4/30/2013. (nbp)
November 15, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's Rule 56(f)request. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Hugh Lawson on November 15, 2013. (mbh)
December 2, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's request for additional time; dismissing Defendant Home America Mortgage, Inc. from the case without prejudice. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Hugh Lawson on 12/2/2013. (nbp)
December 19, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 56 Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 12/19/2013. (tlh)
February 13, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 30 Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 2/13/2014. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FAULCONER v. MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY FAULCONER
Represented By: TYLER CHARLES DIXON
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC
Represented By: Russell J. Rogers
Represented By: ANNA MIRSHAK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOME AMERICA MORTGAGE INC
Represented By: ANNA MIRSHAK
Represented By: Russell J. Rogers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: ANNA MIRSHAK
Represented By: Russell J. Rogers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOMEWARD RESIDENTIAL INC
Represented By: ANNA MIRSHAK
Represented By: Russell J. Rogers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]