BLOODWORTH v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al

Defendant: JOHN AND OR JANE DOES and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: EDWARD LAMAR BLOODWORTH
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00112
Filed: March 28, 2013
 
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Macon Office
County: Bibb
Presiding Judge: Marc Thomas Treadwell
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 14 Motion to Strike. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 8/1/2013. (tlh)
September 25, 2013 22 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 17 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 9/25/2013. (tlh)
January 6, 2014 47 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 28 Motion to Compel; DENYING AS MOOT 26 Motion to Quash Subpoena and DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 18 Motion to Amend/Correct. If the Plaintiff believes his claims against the proposed Defendants would be timely, he can renew his motion to amend, with an attached proposed amended complaint containing allegations tending to establish his new claims are timely, by January 17, 2014. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 1/6/2014. (tlh)
February 14, 2014 59 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 48 Motion to Amend/Correct; DENYING as moot 51 Motion for an Order on Cassidy Immunity; and DENYING 57 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 2/14/2014. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: BLOODWORTH v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND OR JANE DOES
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD LAMAR BLOODWORTH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]