Ballew et al v. Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation et al

Defendant: Random Properties Acquisition Corporation III and Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation
Plaintiff: MARCUS S BALLEW and Pamela E Ballew
Case Number: 7:2011cv00138
Filed: October 10, 2011
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Valdosta Office
County: Tift
Presiding Judge: Hugh Lawson
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 4 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 5 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 8 Motion to Remand. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 2/13/2012. (nbp)
October 12, 2011 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing Defendants until 10/21/2011 to file amendment addressing subject matter jurisdiction. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 10/12/2011. (nbp)
October 18, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Response to Motion re: 4 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation, Random Properties Acquisition Corporation III, 5 MOTION to Dismiss /DISSOLVE INJUNCTION filed by Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation, Random Properties Acquisition Corporation III. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 10/18/2011. (nbp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ballew et al v. Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Random Properties Acquisition Corporation III
Represented By: Frank Reid Olson
Represented By: Todd H. Surden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation
Represented By: Todd H. Surden
Represented By: Frank Reid Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCUS S BALLEW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela E Ballew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.